Khattak, Mohammad Sohail (CPSO#: 64200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Persian, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 301
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: (905) 683-4440
Fax: (905) 683-3303
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sohail Khattak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khattak ( CPSO# 64200 )

Business Address:
301 - 300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone Number: (905) 683-4440

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD SOHAIL KHATTAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATTAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1997