Kherani, Safeena (CPSO#: 79561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone: (613) 526-5737
Fax: (613) 526-3402
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Safeena Kherani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kherani ( CPSO# 79561 )
Dr. I. Kherani ( CPSO# 106580)

Business Address:
Unit 302
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone Number: (613) 526-5737

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
Department of Ophthalmology
Suite W3248 Box 307
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAFEENA KHERANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHERANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2009