Khodaei, Minoo (CPSO#: 92866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria
Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khodaei Thornton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khodaei ( CPSO# 92866 )
Dr. A. Thornton ( CPSO# 93641 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINOO KHODAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHODAEI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 May 2011 to 19 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Nov 2011 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012