Khong, Ngoc Thi Bich (CPSO#: 71733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2086 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 3
Toronto ON  M9N 3Z9
Phone: (416) 240-0777
Fax: (416) 240-7228
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ngoc Khong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Khong ( CPSO# 71733 )

Business Address:
2086 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 3
Toronto ON  M9N 3Z9
Phone Number: (416) 240-0777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NGOC THI BICH KHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jan 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2000