Killorn, William Patrick (CPSO#: 50969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone: (905) 639-3209
Fax: (905) 639-3452
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Patrick Killorn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Killorn ( CPSO# 50969 )

Business Address:
401 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 639-3209

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM PATRICK KILLORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILLORN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 6 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2007