Kilmurry, Matthew Richard (CPSO#: 70363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
525 Belmont Ave.
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 742-6696
Fax: (519) 742-9520
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Kilmurry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kilmurry ( CPSO# 70363 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
525 Belmont Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 742-6696

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW RICHARD KILMURRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILMURRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001