Kim, David Hae-Min (CPSO#: 76127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Stroke Prevention Clinic
Ambulatory Services Clinic 3
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7601
Fax: (905) 472-7621
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
EMG Lab
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7020
Fax: (905) 472-7078
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID HAE-MIN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006