Kim, Doh Hun (CPSO#: 50970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Regional Nephrology Clinic
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-3951
Fax: (905)813-3830
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kim ( CPSO# 50970 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (647) 821-5442

Business Address:
5803 Yonge Street
Suite 104
Toronto ON  M2M 3V5
Phone Number: (647) 346-5688

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 07 Sep 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOH HUN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1984