Kim, Florence Anne (CPSO#: 78135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
175 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1P7
Phone: 416-535-8501
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Florence Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kim ( CPSO# 78135 )

Business Address:
CAMH
175 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1P7
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FLORENCE ANNE KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2005