Kim, Harold Leeyonge (CPSO#: 63757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 745-9525
Fax: (519) 745-9501
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harold Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kim ( CPSO# 63757 )

Business Address:
205 - 525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 745-9525

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 03 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAROLD LEEYONGE KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Clinical Immunology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1992