Kim, Jun-Nyun (CPSO#: 70236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins And District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-6340
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jun Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kim ( CPSO# 70236 )

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 363-8872

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUN-NYUN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998