Kim, Tae Kyoung (CPSO#: 79802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 02 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Seoul National University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: 4163403372
Fax: 4164930502
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: 4169464501 Ext. 4833
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 4166035800 Ext. 2719
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave, Toronto
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 596-4200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St, Toronto
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Tae Kyoung Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kim ( CPSO# 79802 )

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Suite 562
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto General Hospital
1 PMB-279
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 918
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jul 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAE KYOUNG KIM may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAL IMAGING, UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. KIM holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. KIM may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. KIM no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. KIM no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. KIM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 May 2007