Kim, Young-In (CPSO#: 58053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Gastroenterology
16-038 Cardinal Carter Wing
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5848
Fax: (416) 864-5994
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Young-In Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kim ( CPSO# 58053 )

Business Address:
Division of Gastroenterology
16-038 Cardinal Carter Wing
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOUNG-IN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988