King, Caroline Anne (CPSO#: 70164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
17 King Street East
Dundas ON  L9H 1B7
Phone: (905) 628-5656
Fax: (905) 628-5049
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Misiaszek & King Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Misiaszek ( CPSO# 71425 )
Dr. C. King ( CPSO# 70164 )

Business Address:
Centre for Healthy Aging
St Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 777-3837

Business Address:
Suite 105
17 King Street East
Dundas ON  L9H 1B7
Phone Number: (905) 628-5656

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE ANNE KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001