King, William Ian Nelson (CPSO#: 64039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Humber College Blvd
Suite 310
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 742-0506
Fax: (416) 742-1666
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

40 Westmore Drive, Suite 209
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 749-9444
Fax: (416) 749-9446
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nelson King Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. King ( CPSO# 64039 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 742-0506

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 742-0506

Business Address:
40 Westmore Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4C2
Phone Number: (416) 749-9444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM IAN NELSON KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1992