Kirkpatrick, Howard Roy (CPSO#: 50976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huntsville Professional Building
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 205
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-6401
Fax: (705) 789-4734
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roy Kirkpatrick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kirkpatrick ( CPSO# 50976 )

Business Address:
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 205
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-6401

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut
Tanzania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD ROY KIRKPATRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRKPATRICK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1986