Kirlew, Michael Livingstone (CPSO#: 82492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout First Nations
Health Authority
Primary Health Care Unit
P O Boag 4000
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K2
Phone: 807 737 3030
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Room 1464D
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8132
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Kirlew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kirlew ( CPSO# 82492 )

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout First Nations
Health Authority
Primary Health Care Unit
P O Bag 4000
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LIVINGSTONE KIRLEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRLEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007