Klahsen, Andrew James (CPSO#: 63657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2333
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Suite 200
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 650-2777
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolyn Klahsen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kolyn ( CPSO# 59578 )
Dr. A. Klahsen ( CPSO# 63657 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2333

Business Address:
Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone Number: (519) 740-1625

Business Address:
Tri-City Colonoscopy
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES KLAHSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAHSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992