Klukach, John James (CPSO#: 68907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 2799
Fax: (416) 583-1257
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 3120
Fax: (416) 469-6805
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN JAMES KLUKACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLUKACH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000