Knight, Caroline Alison (CPSO#: 64027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
1580 Merivale Road
Nepean ON  K2G 4B5
Phone: (613) 226-4030
Fax: (613) 225-3891
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Caroline Knight Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Knight ( CPSO# 64027 )

Business Address:
Suite 309
1580 Merivale Road
Nepean ON  K2G 4B5
Phone Number: (613) 226-4030

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE ALISON KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1993