Knight, Casey Trudene (CPSO#: 80686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 895-4423
Fax: (905)895-8596
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Casey Knight Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Knight ( CPSO# 80686 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-4445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CASEY TRUDENE KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010