Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ko, Seung Sun (CPSO#: 64697)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malvern Medical Centre
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Fax: (416) 287-3775
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seung Ko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ko ( CPSO# 64697 )

Business Address:
Malvern Medical Centre
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEUNG SUN KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1991