Kobylecky, Anna Audrey (CPSO#: 32593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 29
100 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3P1
Phone: (905) 641-4511
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kobylecky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kobylecky ( CPSO# 32593 )

Business Address:
29 - 100 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3P1
Phone Number: (905) 641-4511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA AUDREY KOBYLECKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOBYLECKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1985