Kocandrle, Karel Petr (CPSO#: 28535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Italian

Education:Charles Univ Prague Faculty Paediatrics, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11163 - 6th line
Acton ON  L7J 2L7
Phone: (905) 878-0148
Fax: (905) 791-3460
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

36 Vodden St. East, # 104
Brampton ON  L6V 4H4
Canada
Phone: 905 455 5455
Fax: 905 455 5154
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Apr 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREL PETR KOCANDRLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOCANDRLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Mar 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1978