Kohli, Kapil (CPSO#: 96000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health Hospital
89 Norman St
Sarnia ON  N7T 4S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tillsonburg Medical Centre Clinic
200 Broadway St
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-4231
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kohli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kohli ( CPSO# 96000 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health Hospital
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAPIL KOHLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOHLI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2014