Kolodziej, Alexander William (CPSO#: 66117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health Services Ctr
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 945-1082
Fax: (613) 945-1070
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Kolodziej Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kolodziej ( CPSO# 66117 )

Business Address:
Canadian Forces Health Services Centre
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone Number: (613) 945-1082

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER WILLIAM KOLODZIEJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLODZIEJ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Apr 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jan 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2004