Komaranski, Norman (CPSO#: 26645)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Norman Komaranski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 4 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Brantford Medical Centre 40 Shellington Place Brantford ON N3S 0C5 Phone: 519-753-9581
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016