Koneru, Rama Devi (CPSO#: 79748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Gandhi Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2827
Fax: (905) 721-6103
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rama Koneru Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Koneru ( CPSO# 79748 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 15 Nov 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMA DEVI KONERU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONERU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008