Kong, Yat Ming (CPSO#: 77945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook & Womens College Hosp
Department of Anesthesia
Suite 3M 200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. M. Kong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kong ( CPSO# 77945 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook & Womens College Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Suite 3M 200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAT MING KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 29 Feb 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007