Kongkham, Paul Narin (CPSO#: 76442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
West Wing 4th Floor Room 4 450
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5428
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016


Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Kongkham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kongkham ( CPSO# 76442 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
West Wing 4th Floor Room 450
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL NARIN KONGKHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONGKHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012