Kontozoglou, Theodosios E (CPSO#: 54635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Athens, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mindelsohn Way
Edgebaston
Birmingham B15 2WB
United Kingdom
Phone: 441213713326
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Kontozoglou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODOSIOS E KONTOZOGLOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONTOZOGLOU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1989