Koobair, Sandhya (CPSO#: 86135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5565 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor ON  N8S 4T9
Phone: (519) 974-6147
Fax: (519) 974-6920
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Koobair Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Koobair ( CPSO# 86135 )

Business Address:
5565 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor ON  N8S 4T9
Phone Number: (519) 974-6147

Business Address:
109 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 258-5696

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDHYA KOOBAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOOBAIR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 May 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2008