Kopyto, Allan Austin (CPSO#: 62641)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Suite 300
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Phone: (905) 387-3667
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kopyto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kopyto ( CPSO# 62641 )

Business Address:
300 - 849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Phone Number: (905) 387-3667

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A4
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN AUSTIN KOPYTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPYTO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991