Korb, Edwin Jonathan (CPSO#: 50991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B23
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 0K2
Phone: (416) 741-2766
Fax: (416) 741-6015
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Canada
Phone: 416 485 9471
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edwin Korb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Korb ( CPSO# 50991 )

Business Address:
B23 - 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 0K2
Phone Number: (416) 741-2766

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Iowa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWIN JONATHAN KORB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORB is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1984