Korz, Linda Tsz Ching (CPSO#: 67795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Lee, Linda Tsz Ching (used until: 09 Oct 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
McMaster Site
Box 2000
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75166
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Korz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Korz ( CPSO# 67795 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Site, 2V
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA TSZ CHING KORZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999