Kosnik, Robert Edward (CPSO#: 29247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
23 Heath Street West
Toronto ON  M4V 1T2
Phone: (650) 248-6300
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

120 Lake Street
San Francisco CA  94118
United States
Phone: (650) 248-6300
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT EDWARD KOSNIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSNIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977