Koubaesh, Yousery Youssef Rizk (CPSO#: 83266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Tanta University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
156 Charing Cross Street
Brantford ON  N3R 2J4
Phone: (519) 759-0010
Fax: (519) 759-4310
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (519) 751-5544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yousery Koubaesh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Koubaesh ( CPSO# 83266 )

Business Address:
156 Charing Cross Street
Brantford ON  N3R 2J4
Phone Number: (519) 759-0010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOUSERY YOUSSEF RIZK KOUBAESH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUBAESH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 14 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009