Koudra, Fahamia (CPSO#: 89489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Champlain Family Health Team
315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke ON  K8A 1P5
Phone: (613) 735-1089
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Koudra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Koudra ( CPSO# 89489 )

Business Address:
West Champlain Family Health Team
315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke ON  K8A 3K2
Phone Number: (613) 735-1089

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAHAMIA KOUDRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUDRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2011