Kovacs, Katherine Ann (CPSO#: 65425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St.
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 2320
Fax: (613) 544-8332
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St.
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-2473
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ANN KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993