Kowtecky, Philip Andrew (CPSO#: 93697)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip A. Kowtecky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kowtecky ( CPSO# 93697 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Waterloo ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP ANDREW KOWTECKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOWTECKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Aug 2011 to 28 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2012 to 19 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2013