Koziarz, Piotr (CPSO#: 66790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Calgary, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 118
115 MacLean Place
Welland ON  L3B 5X9
Phone: (905) 732-0121
Fax: (905) 732-9783
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Koziarz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Koziarz ( CPSO# 66790 )

Business Address:
Suite 118
115 MacLean Place
Welland ON  L3B 5X9
Phone Number: (905) 732-0121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIOTR KOZIARZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZIARZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1998