Krahn, Murray Dale (CPSO#: 55965)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto General Hospital
E N 14 207
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4155
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital, 10EN
Room 249 200 Elizabeth Street,
Toronto , Ontario M5G 2C4
Toronto ON  M5G2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 634 8803
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Murray Krahn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Krahn ( CPSO# 55965 )

Business Address:
The Toronto General Hospital
E N 14 207
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY DALE KRAHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAHN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989