Krajden, Selig (CPSO#: 76605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 703
3300 Highway #7
Concord ON  L4K 4M3
Phone: (905) 669-4800
Fax: (905) 669-8700
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krajden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Krajden ( CPSO# 76605 )

Business Address:
Suite 703
3300 Highway #7
Vaughan ON  L4K 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 669-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SELIG KRAJDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAJDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006