Kraus, Michelle Lauren (CPSO#: 95608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle Kraus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kraus ( CPSO# 95608 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Emergency Department
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE LAUREN KRAUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2014