Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kreidstein, Michael Lloyd (CPSO#: 58036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
300 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M2L 2Y5
Phone: (416) 391-4452
Fax: (416) 391-3031
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Kreidstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kreidstein ( CPSO# 58036 )

Business Address:
211 - 300 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M2L 2Y5
Phone Number: (416) 391-4452

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Anguilla

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LLOYD KREIDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREIDSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988