Kremenchutzky, Carlos Marcelo (CPSO#: 75615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Sep 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Dept Clinical Neurological Science
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3121
Fax: (519) 663-3744
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kremenchutzky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kremenchutzky ( CPSO# 75615 )

Business Address:
London Health Science Centre
University Hospital
A10-308 - 339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 25 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jul 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Aug 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Carlos Marcelo Kremenchutzky may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences, University of Western
                        Ontario, in which  Dr. Kremenchutzky holds a geographical full-time
                        teaching  or  research   appointment   at  the  rank  of  Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching or  research requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  will  automatically  expire when Dr.  Kremenchutzky  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.