Kreuzer, Daniel David (CPSO#: 100883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Springbank Family Medical Centre
Old South FHO
460 Springbank Drive
Suite #306B
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: 5196610047
Fax: 5196610917
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kreuzer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kreuzer ( CPSO# 100883)

Business Address:
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL DAVID KREUZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREUZER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015