Krishnan, Mukta Murali (CPSO#: 74370)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Nagpur University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Simcoe Muskoka
Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43333
Fax: (705) 739-5619
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krishnan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Krishnan ( CPSO# 74370 )
Dr. M. Krishnan ( CPSO# 74248 )

Business Address:
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 205
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 721-1962

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUKTA MURALI KRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 20 Oct 2003
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2004 to 21 Jul 2004
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Apr 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2009