Kroach, Murray Norman (CPSO#: 19927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1966

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1966

Summary

Former Name: Kroch, Murray Norman (used until: 30 Nov 1989 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301-294 Main St
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone: (416) 693-3030
Fax: (416) 693-3033
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Crescent Town Medical
Specialist Centre
4 The Market Place
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Canada
Phone: (416) 690-1357
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

6 - 45 Overlea Blvd
Toronto ON  M4H 4C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 696-9836
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Aims Clinic
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-9788
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kroach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kroach ( CPSO# 19927 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 425-0112

Business Address:
Crescent Town Medical
Specialist Centre
4 The Market Place
Toronto ON  M4C 5M1
Phone Number: (416) 690-2972

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
East York Health Centre
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Phone Number: (416) 698-9836

Business Address:
Multispecialty Medical Clinic
21 Queensway West
Suite 111
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-0788

Business Address:
Beaches Clinic
116 Glen Manor Drive
Toronto ON  M4E 2X2
Phone Number: (416) 698-0999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY NORMAN KROACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KROACH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1966