Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kroft, Fredrick Earl (CPSO#: 19968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1966

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1966

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3 Tullamore Drive
Toronto ON  M2L 2E9
Phone: (416) 785-5017
Fax: (416) 785-5018
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
General Division
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1S1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDRICK EARL KROFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KROFT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1966